WI SB812 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2017-18 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2017-18 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-03SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 218
2018-04-02SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-03-06SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-03-02SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-02-28SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 93, Noes 0
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 1:53 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
2018-02-20HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback