WI SB810 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2015-16 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin State Building Trades Negotiating Committee, for the 2015-16 fiscal year, covering employees in the building trades crafts collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 216 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 93, Noes 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:51 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced |