WI SB808 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.171 (3) (f) 1.; to amend 100.171 (3) (b) 1., 100.171 (3) (b) 2. and 100.171 (3) (d); and to create 100.171 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: notices of eligibility to receive a prize.
Title
Notices of eligibility to receive a prize.
Sponsors
Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] |
Rep. Terry Katsma [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb808 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB808.pdf |