WI SB806 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 196.374 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 196.374 (1) (gm), 196.374 (2) (a) 2. f. and 196.374 (3) (f) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: Focus on Energy inclusion of programs promoting energy efficiency and renewable energy measures for low-income households. (FE)
Title
Focus on Energy inclusion of programs promoting energy efficiency and renewable energy measures for low-income households. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Technology |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Introduced |