WI SB797 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 457.08 (1) (c), 457.08 (2) (c), 457.08 (3) (d), 457.08 (4) (d), 457.10 (4), 457.12 (4) and 457.16 (2); and to create 457.03 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: examinations for certification or licensure by the Marriage and Family Therapy, Professional Counseling, and Social Work Examining Board and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Examinations for certification or licensure by the Marriage and Family Therapy, Professional Counseling, and Social Work Examining Board and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s.227.19(6)(a), Wisconsin Statutes |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb797 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB797.pdf |