WI SB786 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.65 (2) (am) 2., 346.65 (2) (am) 3., 346.65 (2) (am) 4., 346.65 (2) (bm), 346.65 (2) (cm), 346.65 (2) (dm), 346.65 (2j) (am) 2., 346.65 (2j) (am) 3., 346.65 (2j) (bm), 346.65 (2j) (cm), 346.65 (2j) (cr) and 346.65 (3r); and to create 346.65 (2) (br), 346.65 (2) (cr), 346.65 (2) (dr), 346.65 (2j) (br), 346.65 (2j) (cp), 346.65 (2j) (cu) and 346.65 (2x) of the statutes; Relating to: alternative sentencing for certain drunken driving offenses and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Alternative sentencing for certain drunken driving offenses and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Vinehout [D] | Rep. Peter Barca [D] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Rep. Dave Considine [D] |
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Representative Pope added as a cosponsor |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb786 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB786.pdf |