WI SB783 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 450.13 (title); and to create 450.13 (5n) of the statutes; Relating to: therapeutic interchange for drug products prescribed to counteract anaphylaxis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Therapeutic interchange for drug products prescribed to counteract anaphylaxis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateRepresentative Haywood added as a cosponsor
2024-01-18SenatePublic hearing held
2023-12-22SenateRepresentative Subeck added as a cosponsor
2023-12-14SenateSenator Agard added as a coauthor
2023-12-08SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2023-12-08SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback