WI SB780 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (4) (fm) and 93.58 of the statutes; Relating to: grants for obtaining farm tractor rollover protective structures and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for obtaining farm tractor rollover protective structures and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] |
Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Small Business and Tourism |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb780 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB780.pdf |