WI SB770 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 27.01 (10) (d) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: reservations and fees for camping in certain state parks and modifying administrative rules of the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Title
Reservations and fees for camping in certain state parks and modifying administrative rules of the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-22 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |