WI SB765 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 84.30 (3) (a) and 86.19 (1); and to create 84.30 (2) (hm) and 86.19 (1n) of the statutes; Relating to: municipal welcome signs in the highway right-of-way.
Title
Municipal welcome signs in the highway right-of-way.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb765 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB765.pdf |