WI SB76 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 79.096 (3); and to create 79.095 (4) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: distribution of the aid payment for personal property upon termination of a tax incremental district. (FE)
Title
Distribution of the aid payment for personal property upon termination of a tax incremental district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-23-2021 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bernier |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |