WI SB755 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 36.27 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: University of Wisconsin System resident tuition for certain veterans and their family members. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Wisconsin System resident tuition for certain veterans and their family members. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-16SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-02-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-12SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-09SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-06SenatePublic hearing held
2018-02-01SenateRepresentative Skowronski added as a cosponsor
2018-02-01SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback