WI SB752 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.986 (6); to renumber and amend 165.986 (1), 165.986 (2) and 165.986 (4); to amend 20.455 (2) (bm), 20.455 (2) (kb), 165.986 (title), 165.986 (3) and 165.986 (5); and to create 16.20, 165.986 (1c), 165.986 (2) (a) and (c) and 165.986 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to political subdivisions for additional policing and strategic planning to combat crime and grants for beat patrol and specialized officers. (FE)
Title
Grants to political subdivisions for additional policing and strategic planning to combat crime and grants for beat patrol and specialized officers. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] |
Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Representative Milroy added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |