WI SB74 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.60 (3) (am) and 119.23 (3) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: pupil applications to attend a private school participating in a parental choice program.
Title
Pupil applications to attend a private school participating in a parental choice program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cabral-Guevara |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senator Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |