WI SB74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-19)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-19)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Published 11-23-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 116, sections 1m, 2m, 4m, 5m, 6m, 7m, 8m, 9m, 10m, 11m, 12m, 13m, 14m, 15m, 16m, 17m, 18m, 19m, 20m, 21m and 22m, 2017 Wisconsin Act 135, sections 14, 17 and 33 (3), 2017 Wisconsin Act 278, sections 19 and 25 (1) and 2017 Wisconsin Act 319, sections 3 and 6 (2); Relating to: the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact. (FE)
Title
The Interstate Medical Licensure Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Published 11-23-2019 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-22-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 49 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-30 | House | Representative Vining added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senator Smith added as a coauthor |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |