WI SB74 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.301 (2m) (a), 347.413 (1) and 347.50 (1t) of the statutes; Relating to: court orders regarding the installation of an ignition interlock device and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Court orders regarding the installation of an ignition interlock device and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb74 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB74.pdf |