WI SB739 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 767.35 (3); and to create 767.333 of the statutes; Relating to: stipulated orders before judgment in actions for divorce, annulment, or legal separation.
Title
Stipulated orders before judgment in actions for divorce, annulment, or legal separation.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Wimberger [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Laid on table |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 2-22-2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |