WI SB726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 234.01 (6) (b), 234.01 (8) (b), 234.01 (9) (a) 5., 234.13, 234.59 (3) (bc) and 234.60 (3); to consolidate, renumber and amend 234.01 (6) (intro.) and (a) and 234.01 (8) (intro.) and (a); to amend 234.01 (9) (a) (intro.), 234.01 (9) (a) 1., 234.01 (9) (a) 2., 234.01 (9) (a) 3., 234.01 (9) (a) 4., 234.53 (2), 234.55 (1) and 234.65 (1) (c) 2.; and to create 234.135, 234.53 (2m), 234.59 (2) (f), 234.59 (3) (bd) and 234.59 (3) (e) 3m. of the statutes; Relating to: notes, bonds, and economic development programs of the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority, homeownership mortgage loans used to refinance existing mortgages, and uses of the housing rehabilitation loan fund. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notes, bonds, and economic development programs of the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority, homeownership mortgage loans used to refinance existing mortgages, and uses of the housing rehabilitation loan fund. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-21SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2018-02-21SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-16SenateSenator L. Taylor added as a coauthor
2018-02-15SenatePublic hearing held
2018-01-30SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-23SenateRepresentative Barca added as a cosponsor
2018-01-19SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback