WI SB72 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 106.13 (2m); and to create 106.13 (2m) (a) to (p) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring certain occupational areas to be included in the youth apprenticeship program. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring certain occupational areas to be included in the youth apprenticeship program. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06HouseReceived from Senate
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-05-10SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-10SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2019-05-06SenateExecutive action taken
2019-03-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-20SenatePublic hearing held
2019-03-01SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development
2019-03-01SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback