WI SB712 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 349.139 of the statutes; Relating to: the immobilization or removal, impoundment, and disposal of motor vehicles for multiple nonmoving traffic violations. (FE)
Title
The immobilization or removal, impoundment, and disposal of motor vehicles for multiple nonmoving traffic violations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Representative Sanfelippo added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb712 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB712.pdf |