WI SB712 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 69.18 (4) (bm), 979.01 (3), 979.01 (3m), 979.03 and 979.10 (3); to renumber 69.18 (4) (a) 1g. to 6.; to renumber and amend 69.18 (4) (a) (intro.), 157.02 (1), (2), (3), (4) and (5), 979.01 (1m), 979.01 (2), 979.01 (4), 979.02, 979.10 (1) (a) 1., 2. and 3. and 979.10 (1) (c); to amend 20.165 (1) (g), 20.435 (1) (gm), 69.01 (12), 69.18 (2) (d) 1., 69.18 (2) (d) 2., 69.18 (2) (d) 3., 69.18 (3) (a), 69.18 (3) (b), 69.18 (3) (d), 69.20 (2) (a) 2., 157.03 (1), 157.03 (2), 157.055 (2) (intro.), 157.112 (3) (intro.), 157.70 (3) (a), 346.71 (1), 346.71 (2), 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 440.05 (intro.), 440.78 (1) (b), 979.01 (title), 979.01 (1r), 979.015, 979.02 (title), 979.025 (2), 979.025 (3), 979.09, 979.10 (1) (a) (intro.), 979.10 (1) (b), 979.10 (2), 979.10 (4) and 979.22; to repeal and recreate 20.435 (1) (gm), 979.01 (1) and 979.01 (1g); and to create 15.405 (18), 20.165 (1) (hr), 20.165 (1) (kd), 51.30 (4) (b) 29., 69.18 (4) (am) (intro.), 69.18 (4) (b), 69.18 (4) (d), 69.18 (4) (e), 69.18 (4) (f), 157.02 (1m) (title), 157.02 (2m), 440.03 (9) (bm), 440.03 (13) (b) 38d., 440.08 (2) (a) 46t., chapter 465, 979.001, 979.01 (1d), 979.01 (1i), 979.01 (1k), 979.01 (1m) (b), 979.01 (1p), 979.01 (2) (b), 979.017, 979.02 (2) to (7), 979.027, 979.032, 979.034, 979.036, 979.10 (1) (a) 1m. and 2m., 979.10 (1) (d), 979.10 (5) and 979.10 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: reporting deaths; death investigations and other duties of coroners and medical examiners; disposition of bodies; creating a medicolegal investigation examining board; licensure of medical examiners and medicolegal investigation staff members; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Title
Reporting deaths; death investigations and other duties of coroners and medical examiners; disposition of bodies; creating a medicolegal investigation examining board; licensure of medical examiners and medicolegal investigation staff members; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing criminal penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb712 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB712.pdf |