WI SB71 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.55 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing municipal clerks to register voters on election day.
Title
Allowing municipal clerks to register voters on election day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 39 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | LRB correction |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-06-09 | House | Read |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Executive session held |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |