WI SB708 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.02 (2g) (b), 450.035 (1r) and 450.035 (1t) of the statutes; Relating to: the administration by injection of prescribed drugs by pharmacists. (FE)
Title
The administration by injection of prescribed drugs by pharmacists. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb708 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB708.pdf |