WI SB705 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.491 of the statutes; Relating to: liability exemption for motor vehicle sellers after sale.
Title
Liability exemption for motor vehicle sellers after sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 21, Noes 12 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Roys, Bewley, Agard and Johnson |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Felzkowski |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |