WI SB705 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 118.133 (1) (a), 118.133 (1) (b) and 118.133 (2); and to create 118.133 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-19SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski
2020-02-04SenateFiscal estimate received
2020-01-24SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-24SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback