WI SB70 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 799.01 (1) (c), 799.01 (1) (d) (intro.), 799.01 (2), 814.62 (3) (a) and 814.62 (3) (d) 2. of the statutes; relating to: increasing the jurisdictional amount in and the filing fee for small claims actions. (FE)
Title
Increasing the jurisdictional amount in and the filing fee for small claims actions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2011-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb70 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB70.pdf |