WI SB7 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 68-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 227.01 (13) (zz), 344.01 (2) (am), 344.11, 632.32 (4r), 632.32 (6) (f) and 632.355; to renumber and amend 344.33 (2), 632.32 (6) (d), 632.32 (6) (e) and 632.32 (6) (g); to consolidate, renumber and amend 344.15 (1) (intro.), (a) and (b); to amend 121.555 (2) (a), 344.01 (2) (d), 344.55 (1) (intro.), 631.43 (3), 632.32 (2) (e) 3., 632.32 (2) (g) (intro.), 632.32 (4) (a) 1., 632.32 (4) (a) 2m., 632.32 (4) (a) 3m. and 632.32 (4) (d); to repeal and recreate 632.32 (2) (g) 2.; and to create 344.33 (2) (a), 344.33 (2) (b), 344.33 (2) (c), 632.32 (2) (ac) and 632.32 (2) (bh) of the statutes; relating to: automobile insurance coverage limits, permissible policy provisions, and proof of financial responsibility.
Title
Automobile insurance coverage limits, permissible policy provisions, and proof of financial responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 6 laid on table (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 3 rejected (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Refused to reject Senate amendment 1 (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 3 rejected (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Refused to reject Senate amendment 1 (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-03-01 | House | Placed on calendar 3-8-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 25, Noes 7 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 6 offered by Senators C. Larson and Carpenter |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 5 offered by Senators Carpenter, Taylor, C. Larson and Hansen |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 adopted |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Refused to reject Senate amendment 1, Ayes 11, Noes 21 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-02-04 | Senate | Senate amendment 4 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2011-02-04 | Senate | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-8-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 4, Noes 2 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 4, Noes 2 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 6, Noes 0 by committee on Insurance and Housing |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 6, Noes 0 by committee on Insurance and Housing |
2011-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-01-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance and Housing |
2011-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |