WI SB699 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 101.17; and to create 101.17 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: inspection requirements for chemical recovery boilers. (FE)
Title
Inspection requirements for chemical recovery boilers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Representative Spiros added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Representatives Steffen and Felzkowski added as cosponsors |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Senator Stroebel added as a coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Representative Snyder added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb699 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB699.pdf |