WI SB699 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 196.504 (title), 196.504 (1) (a) 3., 196.504 (2) (c) and 196.85 (1m) (b); and to create 196.504 (1) (ae), 196.504 (3), 196.504 (4), 196.504 (5), 196.504 (6), 196.504 (7), 196.504 (8) and 196.504 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: duties of the Public Service Commission under the broadband expansion grant program and certification of political subdivisions under that program. (FE)
Title
Duties of the Public Service Commission under the broadband expansion grant program and certification of political subdivisions under that program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Public Works, and Military Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb699 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB699.pdf |