WI SB697 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 347.50 (1); and to create 218.0152 (4), 347.375, 347.50 (1g) and 632.367 of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle event data recorders, prohibited insurance practices related to accessing or using information collected by event data recorders, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Motor vehicle event data recorders, prohibited insurance practices related to accessing or using information collected by event data recorders, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Representative Hutton added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb697 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB697.pdf |