WI SB695 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 973.017 (2) (b); and to create 973.017 (8m) of the statutes; Relating to: considering post-traumatic stress disorder as a mitigating factor in sentencing certain criminal offenders. (FE)
Title
Considering post-traumatic stress disorder as a mitigating factor in sentencing certain criminal offenders. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |