WI SB688 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 441.06 (4) and 448.61; and to create 440.077, 448.03 (2) (bm) and 448.40 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: practice of certain skilled health services by military medical personnel and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Practice of certain skilled health services by military medical personnel and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Jacque |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Representatives Magnafici and Dittrich added as cosponsors |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Representative Tusler added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Introduced |