WI SB686 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 645.46 (11); to amend 34.07, 138.052 (5) (am) 1., 186.235 (16) (a), 214.54 (1), 214.54 (2), 214.725 (3) (intro.), 215.03 (2) (a), 220.04 (1) (a), 220.06 (1m) and 223.105 (3) (a); and to create 186.235 (7) (b) 4., 214.725 (3m), 214.755 (1) (f), 215.02 (6) (a) 7., 221.0328 (4), 645.05 (3), 645.46 (11) (b) and 645.54 (1) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: confidentiality of financial institution information maintained by the Department of Financial Institutions; periodic examinations of financial institutions; savings bank loan limitations; interest on residential mortgage loan escrow accounts; capital of state banks; security provided by public depositories; insurance company liquidation proceedings; and modifying an administrative rule of the Department of Workforce Development related to an exemption from overtime pay requirements for outside salespersons.
Title
Confidentiality of financial institution information maintained by the Department of Financial Institutions; periodic examinations of financial institutions; savings bank loan limitations; interest on residential mortgage loan escrow accounts; capital of state banks; security provided by public depositories; insurance company liquidation proceedings; and modifying an administrative rule of the Department of Workforce Development related to an exemption from overtime pay requirements for outside salespersons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb686 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB686.pdf |