WI SB684 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 349.11 (3) (c); and to create 349.11 (12) of the statutes; Relating to: local authority to modify highway speed restrictions.
Title
Local authority to modify highway speed restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Representative Schutt added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Representative Green added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Introduced |