WI SB684 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 102.07 (8) (d), 108.02 (24g), 108.04 (8) (e), 108.05 (1) (q), 108.05 (1) (r) (figure), 108.05 (2), 108.05 (2m), 108.09 (2) (cm), 108.14 (27) and 111.327; to renumber and amend 108.04 (8) (d), 108.04 (11) (g), 108.04 (12) (f) 1., 108.04 (12) (f) 2., 108.09 (7) (d), 108.151 (3) (b) and 108.19 (1s) (a); to amend 108.02 (13) (k), 108.02 (21) (b), 108.04 (1) (bm), 108.04 (2) (h), 108.04 (7) (c), 108.04 (7) (e), 108.04 (7) (h), 108.04 (8) (c), 108.04 (12) (e), 108.04 (13) (d) 3. (intro.) and a., 108.04 (13) (d) 4. (intro.) and a., 108.04 (16) (b), 108.05 (1) (r), 108.09 (2) (a), 108.09 (2) (d), 108.09 (2r), 108.09 (4) (c), 108.09 (4) (d) 1. and 2., 108.09 (4) (e), 108.09 (4) (f) 1., 108.09 (4) (f) 2. (intro.), 108.09 (4) (f) 3., 108.09 (4o), 108.09 (5) (b), 108.09 (5) (d), 108.09 (6) (a), 108.09 (6) (b), 108.09 (6) (c), 108.09 (6) (d), 108.09 (7) (a) and (b), 108.095 (2), 108.095 (3), 108.095 (7), 108.10 (1), 108.10 (2), 108.10 (4), 108.10 (6), 108.14 (8n) (e), 108.141 (3g) (a) 3. (intro.), 108.141 (4), 108.141 (7) (a), 108.151 (4) (b), 108.152 (6) (a) (intro.), 108.16 (6) (g), 108.16 (7m), 108.16 (10), 108.18 (7) (a) 1., 108.18 (7) (h), 108.18 (9c), 108.19 (1m), 108.22 (1) (b), 108.22 (1) (c), 108.22 (1m), 108.22 (9), 108.225 (1) (a) and 108.24 (2m); to repeal and recreate 108.04 (1) (b), 108.09 (4) (d) 3., 108.09 (5) (c) and 108.19 (title); to create 108.04 (7) (cg), 108.04 (8) (d) 2., 108.04 (8) (dm), 108.04 (8) (em), 108.04 (11) (g) 2. and 3., 108.04 (12) (f) 1m., 108.04 (12) (f) 2m., 108.04 (12) (f) 3. b. to d., 108.04 (13) (d) 4. c., 108.09 (7) (c) to (h), 108.151 (3) (b) 2., 108.155, 108.16 (6m) (i), 108.19 (1f), 108.19 (1s) (a) 2., 108.19 (1s) (a) 3., 108.19 (1s) (a) 4. and 108.221 of the statutes; and to affect 2011 Wisconsin Act 198, section 4m, 2011 Wisconsin Act 198, section 6m, 2011 Wisconsin Act 198, section 37m, 2011 Wisconsin Act 198, section 47m (1) and 2013 Wisconsin Act 36, section 236m; Relating to: various changes to the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Title
Various changes to the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Government Reform |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb684 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB684.pdf |