WI SB680 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 60, section 115 (1); Relating to: repealing the required transfer of a certain property in the city of Milwaukee to the Wisconsin Center District. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the required transfer of a certain property in the city of Milwaukee to the Wisconsin Center District. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePublished 4-4-2018
2018-04-03SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 205
2018-04-02SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-2-2018
2018-03-23SenateLRB correction
2018-03-23SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-03-20SenateAction ordered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateAssembly Amendment 1 concurred in
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRepresentative Zepnick added as a cosponsor
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in as amended
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 1:14 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
2018-02-20HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-13SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-08SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-08SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-06SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-24SenatePublic hearing held
2018-01-23SenateRepresentative Tusler added as a cosponsor
2018-01-04SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection
2018-01-04SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback