WI SB68 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.115 (7) (dm), 20.115 (7) (tm), 71.613 (2) (intro.), 71.613 (2) (a), 71.613 (2) (b), 71.613 (2) (c), 91.04 (intro.) and 91.62 (1) (a); and to create 71.613 (1) (h) 4., 71.613 (2) (am), 71.613 (2) (bm), 71.613 (2) (cm), 71.613 (2) (d), 71.613 (2e), 91.04 (2) (bm) and 91.10 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: farmland preservation implementation grants, agreements, and tax credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Farmland preservation implementation grants, agreements, and tax credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Representative Tittl added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Representatives Plumer and Kitchens added as cosponsors |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |