WI SB68 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 767.56 and 767.58 (1); to amend 766.70 (4) (a) 3. and 767.59 (3); and to create 767.56 (2c) and 767.58 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: termination of maintenance upon the payee's or payer's death and notices relating to maintenance.
Title
Termination of maintenance upon the payee's or payer's death and notices relating to maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 209 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-10-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-07-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Family Law |
2013-05-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |