WI SB675 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 165.967; to create 165.967 (2) of the statutes; and to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 763qb, 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9426 (1q) and 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, sections 2265p and 9428 (1r) (b); Relating to: the Court Appointed Special Advocates grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The Court Appointed Special Advocates grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senator Darling added as a coauthor |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and Public Safety and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb675 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB675.pdf |