WI SB674 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 69.21 (2) (d) 2. and 69.24 (1) (am); to consolidate, renumber and amend 69.21 (2) (a) and (c); to amend 69.21 (2) (d) 1. and 69.24 (1) (a); and to create 69.30 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: copying, making available, and required notices on, certain vital records. (FE)
Title
Copying, making available, and required notices on, certain vital records. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb674 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB674.pdf |