WI SB660 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 48.66 (1) (b), 48.66 (2m) (am), 48.66 (2m) (bm) and 48.66 (2m) (cm); to renumber and amend 938.357 (4) (b) 2.; to amend 48.48 (9m), 48.60 (2) (c), 48.66 (1) (a), 48.66 (1) (c), 48.66 (2m) (a) 1., 48.66 (2m) (b), 48.67 (intro.), 48.67 (3) (c), 48.67 (5), 48.715 (6), 49.343 (title), 49.343 (1g), 49.343 (2) (a) and (b) 2., 49.857 (1) (d) 3., 51.35 (3) (a), 51.35 (3) (e), 73.0301 (1) (d) 2., 101.123 (1) (ac) 2., 101.123 (2) (d) 3., 108.227 (1) (e) 2., 115.76 (10), 938.02 (15g), 938.22 (1) (a), 938.33 (3r), 938.34 (4d) (b), 938.34 (4m) (intro.), 938.357 (4) (a), 938.357 (4) (b) 1., 938.505 (1) and 938.539 (3); and to create 48.605, 49.343 (1d) (e), 101.123 (1) (gm), 938.221 and 938.357 (4) (b) 2. b. of the statutes; Relating to: secured residential care centers for children and youth and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Secured residential care centers for children and youth and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb660 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB660.pdf |