WI SB66 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 968.12 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: voice recordings of testimony that forms the basis of an application for a search warrant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voice recordings of testimony that forms the basis of an application for a search warrant.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseReceived from Senate
2021-03-23SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-03-23SenateRead a third time and passed
2021-03-23SenateRules suspended
2021-03-23SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-03-23SenateRead a second time
2021-03-19SenatePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-03-12SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1
2021-03-11SenateExecutive action taken
2021-02-25SenatePublic hearing held
2021-02-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2021-02-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback