WI SB66 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.144 (1) (a) 3. and 34.08 (2); and to create 20.144 (1) (a) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: payments for losses of public deposits in failed or failing financial institutions. (FE)
Title
Payments for losses of public deposits in failed or failing financial institutions. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |