WI SB657 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 48.23 (4); to amend 48.20 (8) (a), 48.21 (3) (d), 48.213 (2) (d) and 48.23 (3); and to create 48.23 (2) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: a parent's right to counsel in a child in need of protection or services proceeding, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A parent's right to counsel in a child in need of protection or services proceeding, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-14SenateSenator Darling added as a coauthor
2018-02-12SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-02-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-09SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2018-02-09SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2018-02-08SenateExecutive action taken
2018-02-02SenateWithdrawn from committee on Judiciary and Public Safety and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
2018-01-30SenatePublic hearing held
2018-01-29SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
2018-01-10SenateFiscal estimate received
2018-01-08SenateRepresentative Quinn added as a cosponsor
2017-12-22SenateRepresentative Edming added as a cosponsor
2017-12-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-12-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback