WI SB656 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: a committee to study and make recommendations on the caseloads of child welfare workers. (FE)
Title
A committee to study and make recommendations on the caseloads of child welfare workers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senator Darling added as a coauthor |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Representative Quinn added as a cosponsor |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb656 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB656.pdf |