WI SB65 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.355 (3) (a), 48.42 (1m) (d), 48.428 (6) (a) and 938.355 (3) (a); and to create 48.38 (4) (bv) and 938.38 (4) (bv) of the statutes; relating to: the effect of an order denying, limiting, discontinuing, or prohibiting parental visitation with a child who is adjudged to be in need of protection or services, who is the subject of a termination of parental rights petition, or who is in sustaining care following a termination of parental rights on visitation between the child and a sibling and requiring a child's permanency plan to include a statement as to whether visitation between the child and a sibling is in the best interests of the child and sibling when parental visitation is denied, limited, discontinued, or prohibited.
Title
The effect of an order denying, limiting, discontinuing, or prohibiting parental visitation with a child who is adjudged to be in need of protection or services, who is the subject of a termination of parental rights petition, or who is in sustaining care following a termination of parental rights on visitation between the child and a sibling and requiring a child's permanency plan to include a statement as to whether visitation between the child and a sibling is in the best interests of the child and sibling when parental visitation is denied, limited, discontinued, or prohibited.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Sen. Pamela Galloway [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Rep. Dean Kaufert [R] |
Rep. Steve Kestell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lazich |
2011-04-21 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Human Services, and Revenue |
2011-04-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb65 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB65.pdf |