WI SB648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: requiring pediatricians and pediatric specialists to view presentations about neuroimmune disorders in children. (FE)
Title
Requiring pediatricians and pediatric specialists to view presentations about neuroimmune disorders in children. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb648 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB648.pdf |