WI SB648 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 16.754 (2); to amend 16.75 (1) (a) 1. and 16.754 (3); to repeal and recreate 16.754 (title); and to create 16.24, 16.705 (1b) (e), 16.705 (10), 16.754 (2) (b) and 20.505 (4) (kc) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a Wisconsin conservation corps program, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing exemptions from emergency rule procedures, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making an appropriation.
Title
Establishing a Wisconsin conservation corps program, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing exemptions from emergency rule procedures, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Genrich added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Representative Barca added as a cosponsor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Representatives Steffen and Ballweg added as cosponsors |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Senator Johnson added as a coauthor |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb648 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB648.pdf |