WI SB641 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.09 (2m) (a) 2. and 341.09 (2m) (d); and to create 341.09 (2m) (a) 1m. and 341.09 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Brad Pfaff [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] | Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] |
Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Senator Wimberger added as a coauthor |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Introduced |