WI SB63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.889 (2) (c), 29.889 (2) (d), 29.889 (3), 29.889 (4) (a), 29.889 (6) (a), 29.889 (7) (b) 4., 29.889 (7) (bm) and 29.89 (3) (a); to renumber 29.889 (7m) (ar) 1. and 2.; to consolidate, renumber and amend 29.889 (5) (b) and (c); to amend 20.370 (5) (fq), 29.889 (2) (a), 29.889 (4) (b), 29.889 (4) (c), 29.889 (5) (a), 29.889 (5) (bm), 29.889 (5) (bs), 29.889 (6) (d), 29.889 (6) (em), 29.889 (6) (f), 29.889 (7) (a), 29.889 (7) (b) (intro.), 29.889 (7) (b) 2., 29.889 (7) (b) 3., 29.889 (7) (d) 2., 29.889 (7m) (a), 29.889 (7m) (ar) (intro.), 29.889 (8g), 29.889 (8r) and 29.89 (5) (b) 2. c.; and to create 29.889 (5) (d) and 29.889 (7m) (ar) 2m. of the statutes; Relating to: the wildlife damage abatement program and the wildlife damage claim program. (FE)
Title
The wildlife damage abatement program and the wildlife damage claim program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2022-01-07 | Senate | LRB correction |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Representative Vruwink added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-09 | Senate | LRB correction |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Introduced |